+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Health
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Serial Referral To Health Added
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor