+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/07/2019
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 7, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor