+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Pursuant to 38A
- Reptd Fav
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee A
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 1 -
- 105 -
- 1-635 -
- 105-241.17 -
- 105-241.19 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2013: M4 Previous Question/M8 Finance Second Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
May 6, 2013: M8 Re-Refer Finance Second Reading
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor