+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/8/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-27
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/31/2017
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 25, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
April 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6