+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/25/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 14 -
- 115C -
- 143 -
- 160A -
- 162 -
- 115C-105.27 -
- 115C-105.49 -
- 115C-105.50 -
- 115C-105.51 -
- 115C-105.52 -
- 115C-105.53 -
- 115C-238.29F -
- 115C-238.66 -
- 115C-316.1 -
- 115C-47 -
- 14-269.2 -
- 143-318.11 -
- 160A-282 -
- 160A-288.4 -
- 162-25 -
+ − Vote
April 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor