+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 23, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 29, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6