+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Health Care
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2016
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/06/2016
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
June 15, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor