+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government I
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
March 28, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor