+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/13/2013
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/12/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2013: A1 Horn Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
March 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor