+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 6, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor