+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Serial Referral To Pensions and Retirement Stricken
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor