+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/09/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
+ − Vote
May 9, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor