+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2013-254
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/08/2013
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/23/2013
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Government
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 156-79
- 156-81