+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 25, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-181
- Signed by Gov. 7/25/2017
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017
- Ratified
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/23/2017
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105
- 105-164.13
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 2
May 23, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7