+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-206
- Signed by Gov. 6/26/2013
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2013
- Ratified
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/13/2013
- Conf Com Reported
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed On Cal For 06/17/2013
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/21/2013
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Rec To Concur S Com Sub
- Rec From Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Reptd Fav
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 143 -
- 143-138 -
- 143-151.70 -
- 143-151.71 -
- 143-151.72 -
- 143-151.73 -
- 143-151.74 -
- 143-151.75 -
- 143-151.76 -
- 143-151.77 -
+ − Votes (8)
June 17, 2013: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
June 17, 2013: C RPT Adopted
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
May 21, 2013: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 15, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 14, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
April 11, 2013: A1 Whitmire Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
April 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor