+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Postponed To 04/22/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/16/2015
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 90
- 90-21.11
+ − Vote
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor