+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2018-89
- Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
- Ratified
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Failed A1
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/05/2017
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Health
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 55B
- 122C
- 122C-263.1
- 55B-14
- 145
- 145-50
+ − Votes (6)
June 14, 2018: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 24
June 14, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
April 6, 2017: A1 Insko Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 85
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
April 6, 2017: A2 Cunningham Third Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 7
April 6, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 7
April 5, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor