+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2017-59
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2017
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/22/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/19/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development
- Reptd Fav
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- No affected General Statutes
+ − Vote
June 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2