+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-175
- Ratified
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred On 3rd Reading
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred On 2nd Reading
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/04/2015
- Ruled Material
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Cal
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On June 17, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (6)
August 5, 2015: M11 Concur R3 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 9
August 4, 2015: M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l
- Yeas: 104
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 9
July 29, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
July 28, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 16, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
June 15, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor