+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/04/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Appropriations Added
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 20
- 20-17.8
- 20-19
+ − Vote
April 4, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor