+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
- Reptd Fav
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary III
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 126
- 126-20
- 126-34.02
- 126-5
+ − Vote
April 11, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor