+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Ruled Material
- Placed On Cal For 06/28/2016
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Rule 38
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary III
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- 7B
- 20
- 48A
- 58
- 131D
- 131D-10.2A
- 20-11
- 20-309
- 48A-4
- 58-36-43
- 7B-505
- 7B-800.1
- 7B-901
- 7B-903.1
- 7B-912
- 157-4.1
- 157-4.2
- 160A-475
- 157
- 160A
+ − Votes (4)
June 27, 2016: Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 24, 2016: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
June 24, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 10
April 27, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor