+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-50
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Veto Received From House
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Veto Overridden
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Veto Overridden
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/03/2015
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed 05/29/2015
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/20/2015
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Tabled A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/22/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 99A
- 99A-1
- 99A-2
+ − Votes (7)
June 3, 2015: Veto Override
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
June 3, 2015: Motion 11 Override Veto
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 18, 2015: Amendment 1 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 4
May 18, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 4
May 18, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
April 22, 2015: A1 Glazier Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 2
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor