+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/07/2013
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned To Judiciary Subcommittee C
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
May 7, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor