+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/19/2013
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20
- 20-138.5
+ − Vote
March 19, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor