+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-182
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/30/2015
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 27, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 14
- 14-112.3
- 1
- 7A
- 1-116
- 1-119
- 7A-308
+ − Votes (4)
July 28, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 106
- Absent: 14
July 22, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
July 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
April 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor