+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Finance
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On August 12, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On August 11, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A3
- Ruled Material
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A2
- Ruled Material
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Ruled Material
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/05/2015
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Finance
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 105-512.1
- 105-512.2
- 105-512.3
- 105-512.4
- 105-512.5
+ − Votes (6)
August 13, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
August 12, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
August 11, 2015: A3 Goodman Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 6
August 10, 2015: A2 Jordan Third Reading
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
August 6, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 11
August 5, 2015: A1 Hager Second Reading
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor