+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-181
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/30/2015
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 28, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (67)
- 7B
- 8
- 14
- 15A
- 48
- 50
- 50B
- 90
- 143B
- 14-202.4
- 14-203
- 14-205.2
- 14-208.26
- 14-208.40
- 14-208.40A
- 14-208.40B
- 14-208.6
- 14-27.1
- 14-27.10
- 14-27.20
- 14-27.21
- 14-27.22
- 14-27.23
- 14-27.24
- 14-27.25
- 14-27.26
- 14-27.27
- 14-27.28
- 14-27.29
- 14-27.2A
- 14-27.3
- 14-27.30
- 14-27.31
- 14-27.32
- 14-27.33
- 14-27.34
- 14-27.36
- 14-27.4
- 14-27.4A
- 14-27.5
- 14-27.5A
- 14-27.7A
- 14-27.8
- 14-401.16
- 143B-1200
- 15A-136
- 15A-145.4
- 15A-145.5
- 15A-290
- 4-208.40A
- 48-3-603
- 50-13.1
- 50-16.1A
- 50B-1
- 7B-101
- 7B-1103
- 7B-1104
- 7B-1602
- 7B-2509
- 7B-2513
- 7B-2514
- 7B-2516
- 7B-2600
- 7B-401.1
- 8-53.12
- 90-171.38
- 90-210.25B
+ − Votes (3)
July 28, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 106
- Absent: 14
July 20, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
April 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor