+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2017-53
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/30/2017
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government I
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 44-51.8 -