+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Vote
April 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor