+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-153
- Signed by Gov. 7/16/2015
- Pres. To Gov. 7/16/2015
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On July 14, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
On July 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/14/2015
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (3)
July 14, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
July 1, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor