+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/06/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/05/2017
- Withdrawn From Cal
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/29/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Education - K-12
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 115C
- 115C-84.2
+ − Votes (4)
April 10, 2017: Third Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 6
April 6, 2017: M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
April 6, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 100
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
April 6, 2017: M12 Suspend Rules Third Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor