+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 9/30/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-258
On September 25, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/25/2015
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On September 23, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
On September 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed On Cal For 09/24/2015
On September 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 09/24/2015
On September 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 15, 2015 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 2, 2015 in the House:
- Failed Concur In S Com Sub
On September 1, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 09/02/2015
On July 27, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Redistricting
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Elections
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 163-119.
- 163-182.4
- 163-182.5
- 163-82.6
- 163
+ − Votes (6)
September 24, 2015: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 49
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 18
September 24, 2015: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 7
September 2, 2015: M11 Not Concur
- Yeas: 104
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 14
July 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
April 22, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
April 21, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor