+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
- Reptd Fav
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Appropriations
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (17)
- 143B
- 143-320
- 143-323
- 143B-135.204
- 143B-135.230
- 143B-135.232
- 143B-135.234
- 143B-135.236
- 143B-135.240
- 143B-135.242
- 143B-135.244
- 143B-135.246
- 143B-135.248
- 143B-135.44
- 143B-135.58
- 143
- 143-166.13
+ − Vote
April 19, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4