+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From House
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government II
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, State and Local Government II
- Withdrawn From Com
- Serial Referral To State and Local Government II Stricken
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary I, if favorable, State and Local Government II
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 160A
- 160A-290
+ − Vote
April 27, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor