+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021
- Withdrawn From Cal
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/28/2021
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 6, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor