+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Became Law w/o Signature
- Ch. SL 2015-9
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 4/16/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/01/2015
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- 113A
- 116E
- 120
- 130A
- 143B
- 113A-104
- 116E-3
- 120-123
- 130A-309.202
- 143B-1100
- 143B-283
- 143B-394.15
+ − Votes (2)
April 16, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
April 1, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2