+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-134
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2015
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Finance Added
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Commerce
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Finance Added
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Public Utilities
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 62
- 62-302
+ − Votes (4)
June 29, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
June 25, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
April 15, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 2
April 14, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Absent: 8