+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-71
- Signed by Gov. 6/11/2015
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/5/2015
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary III
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
April 29, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 115
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor