+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Failed 2nd Reading
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/22/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Elections
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 163
- 163-106
- 163-115.1
- 163-122
- 163-123
- 163-165.6
- 163-182.1
- 163-98
- C-III-2
+ − Vote
April 22, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor