+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/21/2021
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Vote
April 14, 2021: Second Reading
- Yeas: 118
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor