+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 30, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 27, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 20
- 20-28.10
- 20-35
- 20-28.2
- 20-28.3
- 20-28.8
- 20-54.1