+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2022
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2022
- Ch. SL 2022-31
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Ratified
On June 28, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Added to Calendar
- Concurred In S Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 22, 2022 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Reptd Fav
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 28, 2022: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 111
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
June 21, 2022: Second Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor