+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2013-174
- Ratified
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/02/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- 153A-15 -