+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary I
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 03/09/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Judiciary II
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20
- 20-138.5
+ − Vote
March 9, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor