+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (35)
On October 29, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Gov. 10/29/2015
- Ch. SL 2015-294
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Pres. To Gov. 9/30/2015
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Concurred In S/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 09/29/2015
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On September 28, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On September 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Failed A5
- Passed 3rd Reading
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Failed A3
- Passed 2nd Reading
On September 24, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed
On September 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 04/23/2015
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Judiciary IV
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Judiciary IV
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (29)
- 15A
- 20
- 58
- 64
- 108A
- 153A
- 160A
- 108A-55.3
- 153A-449
- 15A-306
- 160A-20.1
- 20-7
- 58-2-164
- 64-25
- 64-27
- 64-28
- 64-29
- 64-30
- 64-31
- 64-32
- 64-33
- 64-33.1
- 143
- 143-133.3
- 159-28
- 159
- 108A-51.1
- 153A-145.5
- 160A-499.4
+ − Votes (9)
September 29, 2015: M11 Concur
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 43
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 5
September 28, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
September 28, 2015: Amendment 4
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
September 28, 2015: Amendment 5
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 29
- Absent: 5
September 24, 2015: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 31
- Absent: 7
September 24, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 7
September 24, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
September 24, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
April 23, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor