+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2013: A1 Blackwell Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9
April 11, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor