+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ch. SL 2015-158
- Ratified
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In S Amend SA3
- Concurred In S Amend SA2
- Concurred In S Amend SA1
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/22/2015
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 07/27/2015
- Cal Pursuant 36(b)
On July 20, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
On July 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A2
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On State and Local Government
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From House
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Amend Failed A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (10)
July 22, 2015: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 15
July 22, 2015: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 2
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 7
- Absent: 15
July 22, 2015: M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 3
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 15
July 16, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 2
July 16, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
July 16, 2015: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 2
July 15, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
July 15, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 1
April 1, 2015: A1 Holley Second Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 70
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
April 1, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4