+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received From House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 04/20/2017
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
+ − Vote
April 20, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4