+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
- Rec From House
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 05/13/2013
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Elections
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Statute Amended
- C-VI-4 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Absent: 3
May 13, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor